This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/22/2022 at 00:15:02 (UTC).

HAMZAH NAFIZ MUSTAFA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 HAMZAH NAFIZ MUSTAFA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

HAMZAH NAFIZ MUSTAFA

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Cooper, Joel C Jr

Williams, Gregg Allen

Attorney at Gregg Allen Williams P.A.

355 E Monroe St Ste 1

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2834

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-019342 9/14/2021

9/15/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-019342 9/14/2021

INFORMATION AND CHARGING NOTICE FILED

9/24/2021- D19- INFORMATION AND CHARGING NOTICE FILED

BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

9/15/2021- D32- BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

BOND - AMOUNT $7,503.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

9/15/2021- D33- BOND - AMOUNT $7,503.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

BOND - AMOUNT $1,503.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

9/15/2021- D34- BOND - AMOUNT $1,503.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

9/15/2021- D35- BOND - AMOUNT $2,503.00, COMPANY FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY, INC.

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

10/5/2021- D36- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

10/8/2021- D46- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

11/8/2021- D51- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

11/12/2021- D53- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

1/28/2022- D70- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

2/22/2022- D76- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

3/25/2022- D92- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

4/14/2022- D99- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

10/4/2021- D30- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; 7/25/2022 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; PRETRIAL 05/19/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. WILLIAMS, GREGG ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. COOPER, JOEL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/16/2021; NO FIREARMS, NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 9/16/2021; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 9/16/2021; NO FIREARMS, NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/16/2021; BOND SET AT $50,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 9/16/2021; S790.15(1) DISCHARGING FIREARM IN PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 9/16/2021; S918.13(1)(A) ALTER, DESTROY, CONCEAL, OR REMOVE RECORDS, DOCUMENTS OR PHYSICAL EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/16/2021; S784.021(1)(A) ASSAULT / AGG / WITH A DEADLY WEAPON WITHOUT INTENT TO KILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 9/16/2021; S790.19 SHOOTING/THROWING DEADLY MISSILES INTO DWELLING, PUBLIC/PRIVATE BLDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/16/2021; S790.19 SHOOTING/THROWING DEADLY MISSILES INTO DWELLING, PUBLIC/PRIVATE BLDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/16/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-019342 9/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Gregg Allen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Joel C Jr