This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 23:43:21 (UTC).

HAKEEM ARMANI ROBINSON

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 HAKEEM ARMANI ROBINSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

HAKEEM ARMANI ROBINSON

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DeCoste, Christopher Michael

40 Nw 3Rd St Ph 1

Miami, FL 33128-1838

Atkinson, James Trey

 

Court Documents

PER JA E-MAIL

10/7/2022- D221- PER JA E-MAIL

@2:00 P.M. PER JA E-MAIL

4/22/2022- D174- @2:00 P.M. PER JA E-MAIL

CORRESPONDENCE

8/17/2022- D204- CORRESPONDENCE

RECEIPT FOR CIVIL PROCESS, JAIL, WARRANTS

8/23/2022- D206- RECEIPT FOR CIVIL PROCESS, JAIL, WARRANTS

ORDER TO TRANSPORT

8/17/2022- D205- ORDER TO TRANSPORT

COURT ORDER DENYING DEFT'S MT. TO DISQUALIFY STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF THE FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

3/3/2022- D122- COURT ORDER DENYING DEFT'S MT. TO DISQUALIFY STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE OF THE FOURTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT

@3:15 P.M. PER JA E-MAIL/ (5/26/22 FPT; 6/06/22 JS)

2/28/2022- D119- @3:15 P.M. PER JA E-MAIL/ (5/26/22 FPT; 6/06/22 JS)

CLERKS EXHIBIT MEMO

2/18/2022- D105- CLERKS EXHIBIT MEMO

CLERKS MEMO OF HEARING

2/18/2022- D104- CLERKS MEMO OF HEARING

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: PRETRIAL; Location: 3rd Floor; Courtroom: 307

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: PRETRIAL; Location: 3rd Floor; Courtroom: 307

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; PRETRIAL 01/31/2023 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; OTHERS PRESENT: DEFENSE CO-COUNSEL: T. KAWASS (VIA ZOOM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. DECOSTE, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; OTHERS PRESENT ASA: J. COOPER FOR T. ATKINSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. ATKINSON, JAMES TREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/6/2022; JUDGE SALVADOR, TATIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: PRETRIAL; Location: 3rd Floor; Courtroom: 307; Cancelled: Yes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
238 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/1/2021; ASST. STATE ATTY. ATKINSON, JAMES TREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/1/2021; JUDGE SALVADOR, TATIANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; ARRAIGNMENT DATE 04/01/2021 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/30/2021; INFORMATION FILED S782.04(2) MURDER IN THE SECOND DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/01/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/12/2021; BOND SET AT $3,000,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/12/2021; S782.04(2) MURDER - SECOND DEGREE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-018875 03/10/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DeCoste, Christopher Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Atkinson, James Trey