This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2023 at 02:03:07 (UTC).

FAMOUS KIMANI DESHAY EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 FAMOUS KIMANI DESHAY EDWARDS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TYGART, LINDSAY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TYGART, LINDSAY L

 

Party Details

Defendant

FAMOUS KIMANI DE'SHAY EDWARDS

Jacksonville, FL 32205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lufrano, Matthew Ian

1010 E Adams St Ste 205

Jacksonville, FL 32202-1902

Jimerson, Carleshia Jeanine

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

10/27/2022- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

10/27/2022- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

10/27/2022- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

BOND - AMOUNT $10,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE CO.

11/1/2022- D10- BOND - AMOUNT $10,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE CO.

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

11/17/2022- D13- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

11/18/2022- D14- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

12/6/2022- D16- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

12/6/2022- D18- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-028280 10/24/2022

10/25/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-028280 10/24/2022

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE - EMAILED

12/28/2022- D26- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE - EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

12/29/2022- D37- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

2/2/2023- D43- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: PRETRIAL; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 505

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/2/2023; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: PRETRIAL; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 505

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; PRETRIAL 02/22/2023 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; DEFENDANT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; ATTY. FOR DEF. LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; ASST. STATE ATTY. JIMERSON, CARLESHIA JEANINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntered: 2/1/2023; JUDGE TYGART, LINDSAY L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: ARRAIGNMENT DATE; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 505

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/29/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2022
  • FinancialDescription: PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed: $50.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 11/16/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; FEES DUE: 10/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 10/27/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 10/27/2022; S810.02(4)(B) BURGLARY/CONVEYANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-028280 10/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less