This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/29/2022 at 22:36:45 (UTC).

FAHEEM MALIK SCHWARHA

Case Summary

On 10/03/2021 FAHEEM MALIK SCHWARHA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

FAHEEM MALIK SCHWARHA

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Whitmore, Carolyn Joy

Pribisco, Tim A Jr

200 Malaga St Ste 1

St Augustine, FL 32084-3507

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

10/3/2021- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

10/3/2021- D10- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

10/3/2021- D11- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-020826 10/3/2021

10/3/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-020826 10/3/2021

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

10/25/2021- D15- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

CITATION NO. AF66LNE AND DATE 10/02/2021

10/3/2021- D13- CITATION NO. AF66LNE AND DATE 10/02/2021

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

11/4/2021- D42- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

11/8/2021- D44- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRIBISCO, TIM A JR

3/8/2022- D64- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PRIBISCO, TIM A JR

MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

11/2/2021- D19- MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

INFORMATION

11/3/2021- D32- INFORMATION

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

3/1/2022- D63- STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED)

4/20/2022- D80- NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (AMENDED)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: FINAL PRETRIAL; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 508

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/12/2022; DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/12/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 30) S790.23(1)(A) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM BY A CONVICTED FELON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. PRIBISCO, TIM A JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. WHITMORE, CAROLYN JOY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2022; JUDGE BLAZS, KEVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: PRETRIAL; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 508

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; @1PM IN PERSON 7/11 JS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; FINAL PRETRIAL 07/07/2022 9:00 AM - 508 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2021; FEES DUE: 10/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 10/5/2021; S790.01(2) CARRYING CONCEALED FIREARM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 10/5/2021; S893.13(6)(A) ARMED: POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 10/5/2021; S893.13(6)(A) ARMED: POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 10/5/2021; CITATION NO. AF66LNE AND DATE 10/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 10/5/2021; S316.123(2)(A) RAN STOP SIGN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 10/5/2021; S790.23(1)(C) POSSESSION OF WEAPON OR AMMUNITION BY CONVICTED UNITED STATES FELON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-020826 10/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less