This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/05/2022 at 03:00:42 (UTC).

ERNEST JUNIOR DICKERSON

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 ERNEST JUNIOR DICKERSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendants

ERNEST JUNIOR DICKERSON

Jacksonville, FL 32209

ERNEST B DICKERSON JR

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Posey, Corie Nichole

Albrecht, Megan Robison

Lynch, Sean Patrick II

Beard, Jordan Tyler

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

1/27/2022- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/27/2022- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/27/2022- D10- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-001826 1/25/2022

1/26/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-001826 1/25/2022

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

2/16/2022- D13- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

2/24/2022- D20- MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 2 YEARS

5/19/2022- D71- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO STATE PRISON FOR 2 YEARS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

5/23/2022- D93- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

5/23/2022- D94- COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

5/23/2022- D96- UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

5/26/2022- D98- UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2022; ORDER OF ADJ OF GUILT AND PLACING DEF ON DRG OFFEN PROB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; UNIFORM COMMITMENT TO CUSTODY OF DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; COMMITMENT CHECKLIST SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/23/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $718.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $718.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/20/2022; CREDIT TIME: 114 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/20/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 114 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2022; FEES DUE: 1/27/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/27/2022; BOND SET AT $15,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/27/2022; BOND SET AT $35,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/27/2022; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESSION OF COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/27/2022; S893.13(1)(A)1 SELL COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-001826 1/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEGAN R ALBRECHT, ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Posey, Corie Nichole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beard, Jordan Tyler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa