This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 07/09/2020 at 14:13:06 (UTC).

ERASMO CRUZ GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 ERASMO CRUZ GONZALEZ was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

ERASMO CRUZ GONZALEZ

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

 

Court Documents

DISPOSITION NOTICE - DROP NOTICE

3/6/2020- D14- DISPOSITION NOTICE - DROP NOTICE

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-003410 2/9/2020

2/10/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-003410 2/9/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

2/10/2020- D7- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

2/10/2020- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/10/2020- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/8/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED S784.045(1)(A)2 AGGRAVATED BATTERY WITH A DEADLY WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/8/2020; DISPOSITION NOTICE - DROP NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/10/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $0.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/03/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; FEES DUE: 2/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/11/2020; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/11/2020; S784.045(1)(A)2 AGGRAVATED BATTERY WITH A DEADLY WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-003410 2/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less