This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 07/27/2020 at 10:46:04 (UTC).

DRESHAUN DAVON JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 01/25/2020 DRESHAUN DAVON JOHNSON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCALLUM, LINDA F. and SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCALLUM, LINDA F.

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendants

DRESHAUN DAVON JOHNSON

Jacksonville, FL 32216

DRE'SHAUN DAVON JOHNSON

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Fallis, George Thomas

The Morris Building 2064 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204-3810

Marcos, Sabrina Marie

Smith, Sabrina Marcos

Giglio, Richard James

Cona, Jamie Virginia

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

7/8/2020- D103- WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

INFORMATION (AMENDED)

7/7/2020- D67- INFORMATION (AMENDED)

INFORMATION

2/18/2020- D28- INFORMATION

PER JA EMAIL

5/5/2020- D55- PER JA EMAIL

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

3/31/2020- D50- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

3/17/2020- D45- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/26/2020- D41- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/19/2020- D29- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FALLIS, GEORGE THOMAS

2/11/2020- D18- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FALLIS, GEORGE THOMAS

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/25/2020- D7- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-001943 1/23/2020

1/25/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-001943 1/23/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2020; JUDGMENT OF GUILT PLACING DEFENDANT IN COMMUNITY CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/10/2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $618.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $618.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/10/2020; WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/10/2020; DRIVER'S LICENSE SUSPENSION FOR 6 MONTHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/10/2020; COMMUNITY CONTROL LEVEL 2 12 MONTHS CONCURRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/10/2020; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY - FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/10/2020; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/10/2020; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; DEFENDANT INFORMED COURT THAT HE/SHE HAS HIRED, OR PLANS TO HIRE A PRIVATE ATTORNEY - NO APPLICATION FOR INDIGENCE NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 1/28/2020; BOND SET AT $20,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 1/28/2020; BOND SET AT $20,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2020; BOND SET AT $20,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/28/2020; BOND SET AT $20,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 1/28/2020; S893.13(1)(C)1 SELL SCHEDULE I OR II OPIUM OR DERIVATIVE WITHIN 1000' OF SPECIFIED AREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 1/28/2020; S893.13(1)(C)1 SELL SCHEDULE I OR II OPIUM OR DERIVATIVE WITHIN 1000' OF SPECIFIED AREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2020; S893.13(1)(C)1 SELL SCHEDULE I OR II OPIUM OR DERIVATIVE WITHIN 1000' OF SPECIFIED AREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/28/2020; S893.13(1)(C)1 SELL SCHEDULE I OR II OPIUM OR DERIVATIVE WITHIN 1000' OF SPECIFIED AREA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-001943 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less