This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/08/2022 at 03:13:30 (UTC).

DAYSHAWN JEROME CRAIG

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 DAYSHAWN JEROME CRAIG was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRANHAM, JEB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRANHAM, JEB

 

Party Details

Defendant

DAYSHAWN JEROME CRAIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Bossen, Michael S

1639 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6103

Green, Karl T

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-015724 6/9/2022

6/10/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-015724 6/9/2022

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

6/13/2022- D5- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

6/13/2022- D6- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

6/22/2022- D13- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

6/24/2022- D14- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

ORDER SETTING BOND AND PLACING DEFENDANT ON HOME DETENTION/ELECTRONIC MONITORING PROGRAM

6/13/2022- D9- ORDER SETTING BOND AND PLACING DEFENDANT ON HOME DETENTION/ELECTRONIC MONITORING PROGRAM

ADDENDUM

6/13/2022- D10- ADDENDUM

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

6/17/2022- D12- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

6/28/2022- D15- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

7/7/2022- D17- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND PLEA OF NOT GUILTY BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

7/7/2022- D18- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

7/19/2022- D24- INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT DATE; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; PRETRIAL 08/25/2022 9:00 AM - 408 4TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/26/2022; PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; DEF. W/READING OF INFO & PLEAD NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. GREEN, KARL T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; JUDGE BRANHAM, JEB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/20/2022; ARRAIGNMENT DATE 07/26/2022 9:00 AM - 408 4TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; ORDER SETTING BOND AND PLACING DEFENDANT ON HOME DETENTION/ELECTRONIC MONITORING PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; FEES DUE: 6/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; NO VICTIM, WITNESS OR CO-DEFT CONTACT/NO FIREARMS OR WEAPONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/13/2022; BOND SET AT $400,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 6/13/2022; S812.133(1) CARJACKING (ARMED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/13/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-015724 6/9/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Green, Karl T

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bossen, Michael S