This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/07/2022 at 01:39:28 (UTC).

DAVION ROBERT GRAY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 DAVION ROBERT GRAY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BORELLO, MARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BORELLO, MARK

 

Party Details

Defendant

DAVION ROBERT GRAY

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Davis, James O III

100 N Tampa St Ste 4100

Tampa, FL 33602-3642

Davis, James O Jr

300 W Adams St Ste 550

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4394

Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Reinhold, Travis A

Attorney at Reinhold Law Firm

255 N Liberty St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2820

Sadro, Carson Alana

 

Court Documents

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

5/18/2022- D19- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013489 5/18/2022

5/18/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013489 5/18/2022

MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY, OR SET BOND

5/20/2022- D28- MOTION TO REDUCE, MODIFY, OR SET BOND

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REINHOLD, TRAVIS A

5/25/2022- D37- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE REINHOLD, TRAVIS A

COURT ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET BOND-GRANTED

5/24/2022- D35- COURT ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET BOND-GRANTED

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

5/25/2022- D38- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

6/8/2022- D41- MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

6/28/2022- D49- MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

CITATION NO. AG55UIE AND DATE 05/17/2022

5/18/2022- D21- CITATION NO. AG55UIE AND DATE 05/17/2022

INFORMATION

6/29/2022- D60- INFORMATION

BOND - AMOUNT $100,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

6/29/2022- D84- BOND - AMOUNT $100,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

BOND - AMOUNT $100,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

6/29/2022- D85- BOND - AMOUNT $100,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

BOND - AMOUNT $5,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

6/29/2022- D86- BOND - AMOUNT $5,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

7/5/2022- D87- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; PRETRIAL 08/23/2022 9:00 AM - 306 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. REINHOLD, TRAVIS A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. SADRO, CARSON ALANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/4/2022; JUDGE BORELLO, MARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT AND INITIAL PLEA CONFERENCE; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/5/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 5/19/2022; S316.221(1) TAIL LIGHTS NONE-IMPROPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 8; Entered: 5/19/2022; S790.27(1)(B) ALTERATION OR REMOVAL OF FIREARM SERIAL NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 5/19/2022; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESSION OF MORE THAN TWENTY GRAMS OF CANNABIS WHILE ARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 5/19/2022; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WHILE ARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 7; Entered: 5/19/2022; S893.13(1)(A)1 ARMED POSSESSION OF ILLEGAL DRUGS (LISTED IN FSS 893.13(1)(A)(1))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 6; Entered: 5/19/2022; S893.135(1)(B)1 ARMED: TRAFFIC IN COCAINE - 28 GRAMS OR MORE BUT LESS THAN 150 KILOGRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/19/2022; S893.135(1)(C)1 TRAFFICKING IN MORPHINE, HYDROMORPHONE, OPIUM HEROIN OR THEIR DERIVATIVES WHILE ARMED WITH A FIREARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/19/2022; S893.135(1)(B)1 ARMED: TRAFFIC IN COCAINE - 28 GRAMS OR MORE BUT LESS THAN 150 KILOGRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013489 5/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : HEARING ON MOTION; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 306

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sadro, Carson Alana

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davis, James O Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wheeler-Sanchez, Vanessa

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Reinhold, Travis A