This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/23/2022 at 01:53:30 (UTC).

COURTNEY LYNN ROBBINS NIPPER

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 COURTNEY LYNN ROBBINS NIPPER was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

COURTNEY LYNN ROBBINS NIPPER

Jacksonville, FL 32258

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Corse, Robert Lucien

3955 Riverside Ave

Jacksonville, FL 32205-3312

Jang, Ju Young

 

Court Documents

ARREST DOCKET FROM BAKER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

3/28/2022- D1- ARREST DOCKET FROM BAKER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

BOND - AMOUNT $4,012.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

3/17/2022- D19- BOND - AMOUNT $4,012.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

4/29/2022- D20- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

6/6/2022- D28- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/6/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL - ARRAIGNMENT WAIVED/PLEA NOT GUILTY; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; PRETRIAL 07/06/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. CORSE, ROBERT LUCIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. JANG, JU YOUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2022; STATES# FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/11/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; NOTICE OF COURT DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/28/2022; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; CASH ONLY/NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/28/2022; BOND SET AT $4,012.68

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/28/2022; S817.61 FRAUDULENT USE OF CREDIT CARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/28/2022; S817.481(1)(3)A GRAND LARCENY BY UNAUTHORIZED CREDIT CARD USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; ARREST DOCKET FROM BAKER COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/29/2022; BOND - AMOUNT $4,012.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jang, Ju Young

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Corse, Robert Lucien