This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 07/23/2020 at 14:31:12 (UTC).

CORY VASHUN DAVIS

Case Summary

On 01/26/2020 CORY VASHUN DAVIS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is AHO, MARIANNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

AHO, MARIANNE

 

Party Details

Defendant

CORY VASHUN DAVIS

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

 

Court Documents

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/26/2020- D6- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002160 1/26/2020

1/26/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002160 1/26/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 3/23/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED M614.120 MAKING THREATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/23/2020; TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/23/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED S784.045(1)(A)2 AGGRAVATED BATTERY - WITH A DEADLY WEAPON - DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/23/2020; DROPPED/ABANDONED S827.03(1)(A) AGGRAVATED CHILD ABUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2020; CHARGING NOTICE - TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT - OUT OF CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/24/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/17/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; BOND - AMOUNT $0.00, COMPANY ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 3/6/2020; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/6/2020; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NO VICTIM/WITNESS CONTACT/NO WEAPON-FIREARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/28/2020; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/18/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ORDER SETTING BOND AND PLACING DEFENDANT ON HOME DETENTION/ELECTRONIC MONITORING PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/28/2020; S827.03(1)(A) AGGRAVATED CHILD ABUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 1/28/2020; M614.120 MAKING THREATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 1/28/2020; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2020; S784.045(1)(A)2 AGGRAVATED BATTERY - WITH A DEADLY WEAPON - DOMESTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002160 1/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less