This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/09/2020 at 14:13:16 (UTC).

COREY D. STUCKEY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 COREY D STUCKEY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Defendant

COREY D. STUCKEY

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Usman, Sarah Yousuf

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

3/9/2020- D20- JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

CITATION NO. 0167180A AND DATE 02/17/2020

2/19/2020- D1- CITATION NO. 0167180A AND DATE 02/17/2020

APPEARANCE DATE 03/09/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

2/18/2020- D2- APPEARANCE DATE 03/09/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CRIM TRAFFIC MIN MAND-7/1/2009; Assessed : $428.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $428.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; JUDGMENT & SENT. W/FINGERPRINTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; FEES DUE: 7/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; SAIEF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; AACC 65.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; SOCIF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; TNC 3.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; LGTF 60.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/11/2020; PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; ACKNOWLEDGE. OF RIGHTS & VOLUNTARINESS OF ENTRY OF PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; ASST. STATE ATTY. USMAN, SARAH YOUSUF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; JUDGE BATEH, MICHAEL I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; INFORMATION PULLED FROM SUSPENSE 2/21/2020 2:07:22 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/21/2020; S812.014(2)(E) PETIT THEFT - (PROPERTY VALUE MORE THAN $100, LESS THAN $750)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CITATION NO. 0167180A AND DATE 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; APPEARANCE DATE 03/09/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less