This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/25/2022 at 00:48:24 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WARREN

Case Summary

On 04/16/2022 CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WARREN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WARREN

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Hixon, Anna Eileen

Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Gaynor, Khary Oliver

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

4/16/2022- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/16/2022- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-010117 4/16/2022

4/16/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-010117 4/16/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : BOND HEARING; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; 9/19/2022 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; PRETRIAL 07/27/2022 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; COURT ORDER DENYING DEFENSE MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BAIL - ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; BOND HEARING HELD IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. BEAUGH, ADAM WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. GAYNOR, KHARY OLIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2022; JUDGE SALEM, R ANTHONY

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/4/2022; INFORMATION FILED S794.011(5)(B) SEXUAL BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 05/09/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; FEES DUE: 4/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/19/2022; BOND SET AT $250,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/19/2022; S794.011(5)(B) SEXUAL BATTERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-010117 4/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gaynor, Khary Oliver

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beaugh, Adam William Joseph