This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 03:25:58 (UTC).

BRITTANY NICOLE GRAHAM

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 BRITTANY NICOLE GRAHAM was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRITTANY NICOLE GRAHAM

Jacksonville, FL 32234

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Farquhar, Troy Michael

Rudolph, Rebecca Anne

Bossen, Michael S

1639 Emerson St

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6103

 

Court Documents

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-014170 5/24/2022

5/25/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-014170 5/24/2022

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

5/25/2022- D5- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

5/25/2022- D6- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

5/31/2022- D11- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

6/1/2022- D14- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

5/31/2022- D12- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

5/31/2022- D13- CERTIFICATE OF CONFLICT & MOTION TO WITHDRAW

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

6/1/2022- D15- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

6/1/2022- D22- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

6/1/2022- D23- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BOSSEN, MICHAEL S

INFORMATION AND CHARGING NOTICE FILED

6/24/2022- D34- INFORMATION AND CHARGING NOTICE FILED

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

6/29/2022- D44- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

BOND SET AT ROR

6/30/2022- D50- BOND SET AT ROR

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 404

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : CRIM MISD BATTERY/ASSAULT 3/30/2022; Assessed : $655.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $655.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; ADJUDICATION OF GUILT WITHHELD FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/26/2022; FEES DUE: 12/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/26/2022; RCTF 151.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/26/2022; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/26/2022; SAIEF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/26/2022; AACC 65.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/26/2022; SOCIF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/26/2022; DOBS 201.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; ARRAIGNMENT 06/01/2022 8:30 AM - 404 4TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; ASST. PUB. DEF. FARQUHAR, TROY MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. RUDOLPH, REBECCA ANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; JUDGE PEOPLES-WATERS, RHONDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/26/2022; BOND SET AT $2,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/26/2022; S784.03(1)(A)2 BATTERY - CAUSES BODILY HARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-014170 5/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rudolph, Rebecca Anne

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Farquhar, Troy Michael

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bossen, Michael S