This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 07/31/2020 at 15:19:20 (UTC).

BRITTANY MARIE FANNIN-CALDWELL

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 BRITTANY MARIE FANNIN-CALDWELL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

BRITTANY MARIE FANNIN-CALDWELL

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Isom, Marcus LeeAndre Jr

Schanze, Sarah Elizabeth

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

7/13/2020- D75- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/27/2020- D31- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

2/26/2020- D27- ** WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL **

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/21/2020- D22- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002419 1/28/2020

1/29/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002419 1/28/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/29/2020- D6- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/29/2020- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

1/29/2020- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 10/13/2015; Assessed : $618.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $618.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; FEES DUE: 1/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/14/2020; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/14/2020; SAIEF 100.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/14/2020; AACC 65.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/14/2020; TNC 3.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/14/2020; PD FEE 100.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; NO CO-DEFENDANT CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/30/2020; BOND SET AT $3,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/19/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/30/2020; S893.13(6)(B) POSSESS NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS OF MARIJUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/30/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002419 1/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/30/2020; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less