This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 11/24/2021 at 00:38:56 (UTC).

BREON ELDRIDGE MASON

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 BREON ELDRIDGE MASON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendant

BREON ELDRIDGE MASON

Jacksonville, GA 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Owens, Leah Allison

Musa, Jose Antonio

774 State Road 13 Ste 15

Jacksonville, FL 32259-3815

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

5/25/2021- D10- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

5/25/2021- D11- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-010686 5/24/2021

5/25/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-010686 5/24/2021

CITATION NO. AEN3XCE AND DATE 05/15/2021

5/25/2021- D15- CITATION NO. AEN3XCE AND DATE 05/15/2021

CITATION NO. AEN3XBE AND DATE 05/15/2021

5/25/2021- D21- CITATION NO. AEN3XBE AND DATE 05/15/2021

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

8/20/2021- D58- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

8/20/2021- D59- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

8/27/2021- D67- ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : FINAL PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : ARRAIGNMENT DATE; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 11/18/2021; PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 11/18/2021; PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 11/18/2021; PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 11/18/2021; PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; 12/13/2021 JS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; FINAL PRETRIAL 12/07/2021 9:00 AM - 605 6TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; DEFENDANT WAIVED READING OF AMENDED INFORMATION AND PLEAD NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2021; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 5/27/2021; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 5/27/2021; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/27/2021; BOND SET AT $75,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2021; CITATION NO. AEN3XBE AND DATE 05/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 5/27/2021; S316.061(1) ACCIDENT; FAILED TO GIVE INFORMATION / LEAVING THE SCENE / PROPERTY DAMAGE / ATTENDED VEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 5/27/2021; S843.02 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE TO HIS OR HER PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 5/27/2021; S790.23(1)(A) POSSESSION OF A FIREARM OR WEAPON BY ACONVICTED FELON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/27/2021; CITATION NO. AEN3XCE AND DATE 05/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/27/2021; S316.1935(3)(A) FELONY FLEEING OR ATTEMPTING TO ELUDE A LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-010686 5/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Musa, Jose Antonio

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Leah Allison