This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 14:21:51 (UTC).

BEST AIRPORT INN

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 BEST AIRPORT INN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Defendant

BEST AIRPORT INN

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Pollock, Cherry Shaw

 

Court Documents

CITATION NO. FP7496 AND DATE 02/04/2020

2/14/2020- D1- CITATION NO. FP7496 AND DATE 02/04/2020

APPEARANCE DATE 03/04/2020 1:30 PM - 201 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

2/6/2020- D2- APPEARANCE DATE 03/04/2020 1:30 PM - 201 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : TRIAL; Location : 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; TRIAL 05/13/2020 1:30 PM - 201 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; CITY ATTORNEY CHERRY POLLOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SITTING JUDGE - BRADY, BROOKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; JUDGE HUDSON, DAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; INFORMATION PULLED FROM SUSPENSE 2/18/2020 11:55:36 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/18/2020; M420.115(A)(1) VIOLATION OF FLORIDA FIRE PREVENTION CODE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; CITATION NO. FP7496 AND DATE 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; APPEARANCE DATE 03/04/2020 1:30 PM - 201 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less