This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/23/2023 at 03:40:03 (UTC).

AUTUMN DENISE SHANNON

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 AUTUMN DENISE SHANNON was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

AUTUMN DENISE SHANNON

Waycross, GA 31501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Lufrano, Matthew Ian

1010 E Adams St Ste 205

Jacksonville, FL 32202-1902

Welch, Victoria Leigh

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

12/20/2022- D5- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

12/20/2022- D6- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

12/20/2022- D9- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

1/9/2023- D12- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-033176 12/19/2022

12/20/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-033176 12/19/2022

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

1/9/2023- D13- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION

1/9/2023- D17- INFORMATION

STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

1/10/2023- D18- STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT AND DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

1/11/2023- D28- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & SPECIFIC DEMAND FOR INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: PRETRIAL; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 505

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • HearingTime: 9:00 AM; Type: ARRAIGNMENT DATE; Location: 5th Floor; Courtroom: 505

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/12/2023; PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; PRETRIAL 02/22/2023 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; DEF. W/READING OF INFO & PLEAD NOT GUILTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; ATTY. FOR DEF. LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; PUBLIC DEFENDER PERMITTED TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; ASST. PUB. DEF. PUBLIC DEFENDER ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntered: 1/12/2023; ASST. STATE ATTY. WELCH, VICTORIA LEIGH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 01/11/2023 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; FEES DUE: 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/21/2022; BOND SET AT $100,003.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 12/21/2022; S810.02(2)(A) BURGLARY WITH ASSAULT OR BATTERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-033176 12/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less