This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 00:01:08 (UTC).

AQUEL PAGE

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 AQUEL PAGE was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Defendant

AQUEL PAGE

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Usman, Sarah Yousuf

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT & SENT.

3/9/2020- D21- JUDGMENT & SENT.

APPEARANCE DATE 03/09/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

2/20/2020- D3- APPEARANCE DATE 03/09/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CITATION NO. 0160455A AND DATE 02/09/2020

2/11/2020- D1- CITATION NO. 0160455A AND DATE 02/09/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CRIM MISD MIN MAND-7/1/2008; Assessed : $428.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $428.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; JUDGMENT & SENT. BOOK 19249 PAGE 1352-1353

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; FEES DUE: 7/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; SAIEF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; AACC 65.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; SOCIF 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; TNC 3.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; LGTF 60.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; 5% CVC 5.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; BASE FINE 100.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/13/2020; PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; DEFENDANT PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; ASST. STATE ATTY. USMAN, SARAH YOUSUF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; JUDGE BATEH, MICHAEL I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; APPEARANCE DATE 03/09/2020 1:30 PM - 301 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/11/2020; S893.147(1) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; CITATION NO. 0160455A AND DATE 02/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less