This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 06/06/2020 at 00:03:21 (UTC).

ANTONIO LATRAVIS ODOMS

Case Summary

On 01/26/2020 ANTONIO LATRAVIS ODOMS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

ANTONIO LATRAVIS ODOMS

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Welch, Victoria Leigh

Duncan, Deana Victoria

Carter, Nathan Edward

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

3/4/2020- D65- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 2 DAYS

3/4/2020- D41- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 2 DAYS

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/19/2020- D31- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

2/12/2020- D21- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002174 1/26/2020

1/26/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002174 1/26/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

1/26/2020- D6- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

1/26/2020- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

1/26/2020- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 2/12/2016; Assessed : $718.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $718.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/5/2020; DRIVER'S LICENSE SUSPENSION FOR 6 MONTHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/5/2020; CONCURRENT WITH COUNT/S 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/5/2020; CREDIT TIME: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/5/2020; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/5/2020; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY - FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/5/2020; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2020; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NO POSS. CONSUMPT ILLEGAL DRUGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/28/2020; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 02/18/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 1/28/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WITHOUT PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 1/28/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESSION OF COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-002174 1/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less