This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/28/2022 at 01:12:55 (UTC).

ANN-MARIE MORGAN

Case Summary

On 03/26/2022 ANN-MARIE MORGAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendants

ANN-MARIE MORGAN

Jacksonville, FL 32254

ANN MARIE MORGAN

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Licandro, Joseph Rudolph

Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/26/2022- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/26/2022- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

3/26/2022- D6- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-007963 3/25/2022

3/26/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-007963 3/25/2022

CHARGES CONSOLIDATED FROM - 16-2022-CF-003225-AXXX-MA

4/13/2022- D22- CHARGES CONSOLIDATED FROM - 16-2022-CF-003225-AXXX-MA

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 12 MONTHS

6/15/2022- D67- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 12 MONTHS

WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

6/15/2022- D102- WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

6/16/2022- D105- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 3/30/2022; Assessed : $718.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $718.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; WAIVER OF PRE-SENTENCE INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 8; Entered: 6/16/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 30) S837.055 GIVING FALSE INFORMATION TO LAW ENFORCEMENT DURING INVESTIGATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 7; Entered: 6/16/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 30) S893.147(1) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE PARAPHERNALIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 6; Entered: 6/16/2022; CONDITIONS AS IMPOSED IN COUNT 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 6; Entered: 6/16/2022; PROBATION 18 MONTHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 6; Entered: 6/16/2022; CREDIT TIME: 82 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 04/18/2022 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; FEES DUE: 3/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/28/2022; BOND SET AT $7,503.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/28/2022; S893.1351(1) KNOWINGLY OWN OR RENT A STRUCTURE OR VEHICLE TO BE USED FOR SELLING DRUGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/28/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-007963 3/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Beaugh, Adam William Joseph

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Licandro, Joseph Rudolph