This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/08/2022 at 03:31:23 (UTC).

ALPHONSO EDWARD MILLS

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 ALPHONSO EDWARD MILLS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

ALPHONSO EDWARD MILLS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Kelley, Jason Ronald

Leonard, Kimberley Dominick Kierrel

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

5/18/2022- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

5/18/2022- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 70 DAYS BOOK 20376 PAGE 2207-2212

7/26/2022- D46- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 70 DAYS BOOK 20376 PAGE 2207-2212

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

7/26/2022- D60- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

7/27/2022- D63- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DEFAULT CASE FEE 3/30/2022; Assessed : $618.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $618.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; RESTITUTION ORDER CREATED FOR: $ $1,100.00 BOOK 20376 PAGE 2200-2201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 7/27/2022; NOL PROS (CODE 30) S810.02(4) BURGLARY (STRUCTURE / CONVEYANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 7/27/2022; FEES DUE: 1/23/2023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/27/2022; CSTF 20.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/27/2022; SAIEF 100.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/19/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/19/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 5/19/2022; S810.02(4) BURGLARY - STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 5/19/2022; S810.02(4) BURGLARY - STRUCTURE OR CONVEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-013343 5/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelley, Jason Ronald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard, Kimberley Dominick Kierrel