This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 03/29/2021 at 02:49:30 (UTC).

ALEX ANTWAN BASS

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 ALEX ANTWAN BASS was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARBULA, MEREDITH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARBULA, MEREDITH

 

Party Details

Defendant

ALEX ANTWAN BASS

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Hogg, Leah Allison

Lufrano, Matthew Ian

1010 E Adams St Ste 205

Jacksonville, FL 32202-1902

Owens, Leah Allison

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM VIOLATION REPORT

3/5/2021- D85- PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM VIOLATION REPORT

MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

2/3/2021- D75- MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO INCUR COSTS OF INVESTIGATION

1/14/2021- D73- ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO INCUR COSTS OF INVESTIGATION

MOTION TO WAIVE COSTS OF GPS MONITORING FEES

11/28/2020- D58- MOTION TO WAIVE COSTS OF GPS MONITORING FEES

INFORMATION

10/19/2020- D23- INFORMATION

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

10/6/2020- D16- REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL RESPONSE - DECLINE

NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

10/5/2020- D15- NOTIFICATION OF ATTORNEY CONFLICT

ORDER SETTING BOND AND PLACING DEFENDANT ON HOME DETENTION/ELECTRONIC MONITORING PROGRAM

9/16/2020- D10- ORDER SETTING BOND AND PLACING DEFENDANT ON HOME DETENTION/ELECTRONIC MONITORING PROGRAM

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

9/16/2020- D7- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

ACKNOWLEDGE. OF RIGHTS & VOLUNTARINESS OF ENTRY OF PLEA

3/16/2021- D93- ACKNOWLEDGE. OF RIGHTS & VOLUNTARINESS OF ENTRY OF PLEA

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

3/11/2021- D87- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPOINT A MENTAL HEALTH AND JUVENILE BRAIN EXPERT

2/15/2021- D82- DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO APPOINT A MENTAL HEALTH AND JUVENILE BRAIN EXPERT

ORDER GRANTING MT. FOR MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

2/4/2021- D76- ORDER GRANTING MT. FOR MODIFICATION OF PRETRIAL RELEASE

PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM VIOLATION REPORT

12/17/2020- D66- PRETRIAL SERVICES PROGRAM VIOLATION REPORT

BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

11/14/2020- D59- BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY

@ 2:00 P.M. (D) M/ FOR BOND REDUCTION (PER JA E-MAIL)

11/5/2020- D48- @ 2:00 P.M. (D) M/ FOR BOND REDUCTION (PER JA E-MAIL)

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/22/2020- D32- NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-019266 9/16/2020

9/16/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-019266 9/16/2020

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : SENTENCING; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; @ 1:30 PM (DEFT.'S PERSONAL APPEARANCE REQUIRED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; SENTENCING 04/20/2021 9:00 AM - 505 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; PSI ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/16/2021; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; ACKNOWLEDGE. OF RIGHTS & VOLUNTARINESS OF ENTRY OF PLEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; DEF. PERMITTED TO W/D PLEA OF NOT GUILTY/GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; DEFENDANT PRESENT (ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2021; ATTY. FOR DEF. LUFRANO, MATTHEW IAN

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; ORDER SETTING BOND AND PLACING DEFENDANT ON HOME DETENTION/ELECTRONIC MONITORING PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/17/2020; BOND SET AT $25,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/17/2020; BOND SET AT $100,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 9/17/2020; S810.09(2)(C) TRESPASS ARMED PROPERTY OTHER THAN STRUCTURE-CONVEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/17/2020; S790.23(1)(B) POSSESSION OF WEAPON OR AMMUNITION BY FLORIDA DELINQUENT ADULT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/17/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-019266 9/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lufrano, Matthew Ian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hogg, Leah Allison

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Leah Allison