This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 09/05/2020 at 00:53:17 (UTC).

ADUNTE MAURICE GIBSON JR

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 ADUNTE MAURICE GIBSON JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FELTEL JR, GILBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FELTEL JR, GILBERT

 

Party Details

Defendant

ADUNTE MAURICE GIBSON JR

Jacksonville, FL 32208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Brown, Coreylyn Crawford

Mason, Erin

Maguire, Annie Jourdan

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

2/19/2020- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

2/19/2020- D4- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : STATUS HEARING; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 408;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2020; CHARGING NOTICE - FELONY BUMP DOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2020; CANCELLED STATUS HEARING ON 7/14/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/6/2020; NOL PROS (CODE 11) - TRANSFER TO HIGHER OR LOWER COURT S810.02(4) BURGLARY (STRUCTURE / CONVEYANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/6/2020; > CANCEL REASON - CASE DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; CONTROL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; STATUS HEARING 07/14/2020 9:00 AM - 408 4TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; DEFENDANT APPEARANCE WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/30/2020; ASST. PUB. DEF. MASON, ERIN

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 03/11/2020 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NO VICTIM CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/20/2020; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; FEES DUE: 2/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; DEFENDANT DETERMINED NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 2/20/2020; S810.02(4)(B) BURGLARY/CONVEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-004211 2/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less