This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/28/2022 at 01:28:43 (UTC).

ABDUL KARIM ROBINSON JR.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 ABDUL KARIM ROBINSON JR was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALVADOR, TATIANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALVADOR, TATIANA

 

Party Details

Defendant

ABDUL KARIM ROBINSON JR.

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Cooper, Joel C Jr

Buck, Benjamin Waldo Jr

113 S Monroe St Fl 1

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1529

Rier, Andrew Franklin

10800 Biscayne Blvd Ste 900

Miami, FL 33161-7492

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

7/23/2021- D10- NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

7/22/2021- D5- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 07/20/2021 CORRECTED DOCKET

7/22/2021- D9- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 07/20/2021 CORRECTED DOCKET

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

7/22/2021- D4- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 7/20/2021

7/21/2021- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 7/20/2021

STATE'S EIGHTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

5/23/2022- D125- STATE'S EIGHTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

DEFT'S EXPARTE MOTION & PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT AN ELECTRONIC EVIDENCE EXPERT & ORDER THE JUSTICE ADMIN. COMMISSION TO PAY COSTS

4/8/2022- D109- DEFT'S EXPARTE MOTION & PROPOSED ORDER TO APPOINT AN ELECTRONIC EVIDENCE EXPERT & ORDER THE JUSTICE ADMIN. COMMISSION TO PAY COSTS

STATE'S SEVENTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

4/8/2022- D108- STATE'S SEVENTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

EX PARTE ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEFENSE TO INCUR COSTS FOR ELECTRONIC EVIDENCE EXPERT

4/8/2022- D106- EX PARTE ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEFENSE TO INCUR COSTS FOR ELECTRONIC EVIDENCE EXPERT

EXPARTE MOTION FOR INVESTIGATIVE COSTS

4/6/2022- D107- EXPARTE MOTION FOR INVESTIGATIVE COSTS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR INVESTIGATIVE COSTS

4/6/2022- D105- ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR INVESTIGATIVE COSTS

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 03/24/2022

3/25/2022- D101- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 03/24/2022

INDICTMENT

3/24/2022- D100- INDICTMENT

ORDER TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES

3/16/2022- D97- ORDER TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES

@2:00 P.M. ((S) M/ JOINDER AND (S) M/ COMPEL) PER JA E-MAIL

3/4/2022- D88- @2:00 P.M. ((S) M/ JOINDER AND (S) M/ COMPEL) PER JA E-MAIL

DEFT'S EXPARTE MOTION OMNIBUS MT. TO APPROVE TRANSCRIPTION OF DEPOSITIONS WITH NOTICE TO THE JUSTICE ADMIN. COMMISSION

2/11/2022- D78- DEFT'S EXPARTE MOTION OMNIBUS MT. TO APPROVE TRANSCRIPTION OF DEPOSITIONS WITH NOTICE TO THE JUSTICE ADMIN. COMMISSION

COURT ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS WITH NOTICE TO THE JUSTICE ADMIN. COMMISSION

2/11/2022- D77- COURT ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS WITH NOTICE TO THE JUSTICE ADMIN. COMMISSION

MOTION TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES

2/2/2022- D76- MOTION TO COMPEL BODY MATERIAL SAMPLES

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/24/2022; STATE'S EIGHTEENTH SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 3rd Floor; Courtroom : 307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; PRETRIAL 06/16/2022 9:00 AM - 307 3RD FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; DEFENDANT PRESENT IN JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; > VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. RIER, ANDREW FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. COOPER, JOEL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; SITTING JUDGE - MCCALLUM, LINDA F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEntered: 5/19/2022; JUDGE SALVADOR, TATIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : PD APP FEE ($50); Assessed : $50.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/23/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 07/20/2021 CORRECTED DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: 08/11/2021 SUBJECT TO CHANGE. CALL FOR VERIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; FEES DUE: 7/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2021; BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 7/22/2021; S782.04(2) MURDER - SECOND DEGREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2021; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2021-015142 7/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIER, ANDREW FRANKLIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cooper, Joel C Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCK BENJAMIN W J