This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 11/09/2022 at 17:45:40 (UTC).

TEAGUE, JUSTIN VS BUGGS, AIRLIA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 TEAGUE, JUSTIN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BUGGS, AIRLIA. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TEAGUE, JUSTIN

Respondent

BUGGS, AIRLIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WATSON, CHANA MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketRETURN(S) OF SERVICE SERVED AIRLIA BUGGS 10/13/2022 @ 3:45PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO SERVE AIRLIA BUGGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketAPP FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketAPP FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PETITIONERS DRIVER'S LICENSE -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000237DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less