This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/15/2022 at 17:58:01 (UTC).

SWANN, MATTHEW EDWARD VS ICE, ELIZABETH

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 SWANN, MATTHEW EDWARD filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ICE, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SWANN, MATTHEW EDWARD

Respondent

ICE, ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR IMMEDIATE REFERRAL TO MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR REALATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ELIZABETH ICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: LINDSEY B LANDER Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR EMERGENCY HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketRETURN(S) OF SERVICE- SERVED ELIZABETH ICE ON 05/24/2022 @ 11:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS- ELIZABETH ICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPET TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 08/14/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001707

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000101DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD