This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 17:48:01 (UTC).

STROUP, ROBERT VS STROUP, DENICE

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 STROUP, ROBERT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against STROUP, DENICE. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STROUP, ROBERT

Defendant

STROUP, DENICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON, CHANA MARIE

Defendant Attorney

LANDER, LINDSEY BOYD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILIBILITY 06/15/2022-06/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketANSWER TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR RESPONDENT - DENICE STROUP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: LINDSEY B LANDER Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: CHANA M WATSON Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO CHILD VERIFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PETITIONERS DRIVER LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS TO SERVE DENICE STROUP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001725

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000103DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less