This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 17:45:49 (UTC).

SCHIAPPUCCI, CALLIE VS SCHIAPPUCCI, JORDAN ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 SCHIAPPUCCI, CALLIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SCHIAPPUCCI, JORDAN ANTHONY. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHIAPPUCCI, CALLIE

Respondent

SCHIAPPUCCI, JORDAN ANTHONY

Not Classified By Court

SCHIAPPUCCI, CALLIE JO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) - PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketANSWER,WAIVER, & REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUD. DI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL- HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL- WIFE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER -WIFE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMOTION TO DEVIATE FROM CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSUR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE W/DEP. OR MIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 12/19/2017 RESPONDENT'S DRIVER LICENSE- ISSUE DATE 06/25/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001694

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000098DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less