This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 17:48:54 (UTC).

MOBLEY, MATTHEW P VS MOBLEY, BREANNA M

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 MOBLEY, MATTHEW P filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MOBLEY, BREANNA M. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOBLEY, MATTHEW P

Defendant

MOBLEY, BREANNA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIMPSON, ELIKA OTOYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketLETTER DIXIE COUNTY FAMILY LAW DIVISION THE TWELVE RULES OF FAMILY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS - TO SERVE BREANNA M MOBLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO MODIFY PARENTING PLAN TIME SHARING PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY CHILD SUPPORT AND FOR RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number MX 2022002098

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRETURN(S) OF SERVICE- BREANNA MOBLEY VIA CERT MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Elika Otoya Stimpson Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF CHILD CUSTODY DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000118DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketJUDGMENT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF CHILD CUSTODY DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000109DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIMPSON ESQ, ELIKA O