This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County on 07/16/2020 at 08:33:47 (UTC).

LYONS, JIMMY VS LAMAR, CINDY O.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 LYONS, JIMMY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LAMAR, CINDY O. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Griffin, Jennifer R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County

  • Courthouse:

    Dixie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Griffin, Jennifer R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LYONS, JIMMY

Defendants

LAMAR, CINDY O.

LAMAR, WILLIAM Y III

LAMAR, CHRISTOPHER LIVINGSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALLEN, NATASHA MUNKITTRICK

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

06/03/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF SALE emailed to the Advocate on 05/15/2020

05/15/2020:NOTICE OF SALE emailed to the Advocate on 05/15/2020

ORDER ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

04/02/2020:ORDER ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ORDER ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

04/02/2020:ORDER ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

MOTION STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

03/13/2020:MOTION STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

02/20/2020:Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

COMPLAINT

12/03/2019:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SALE emailed to the Advocate on 05/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 04/28/2020 11:00; Judge: Griffin, Jennifer R; Docket Type: CASE MANAGEMENT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment AMENDED IN REMCONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (amended to correct math)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketFinal Judgment IN REM CONSENT TO FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF APPERANCE AND, PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516, DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY'S EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CINDY LAMAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR CINDY LAMAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR CHRISTOPHER LIVINGSTON LAMAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR WILLIAM Y. LAMAR III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR UNKNOWN TENANT emailed all below summons to attorney Natasha Allen on 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketCase 152019CA000057CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less