This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County on 09/28/2021 at 15:43:10 (UTC).

LAKE, UNIQUE VS DIXIE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSI Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/29/2021 LAKE, UNIQUE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DIXIE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSI. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKE, UNIQUE

Defendants

DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

DIXIE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARHAT, SAID SAMMY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

09/01/2021:NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

09/01/2021:NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

09/17/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

09/20/2021:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

09/23/2021:NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

09/23/2021:NOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER WITH ATTACHED PLAN AND PROCEDURES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE THIRD JUDICAL CIRCUIT STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES FOR DIXIE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO DEPARTMENT OF FINANCIAL SERVICES FOR DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002763

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIQUE LAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR DIXIE BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FOR PLAINTIFF UNIQUE LAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2021
  • DocketCase 152021CA000045CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARHAT, SAID SAMMY