This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 04/06/2022 at 17:45:25 (UTC).

KOLENDA, REBEKAH VS KOLENDA, DANIEL PAUL III

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 KOLENDA, REBEKAH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KOLENDA, DANIEL PAUL III. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and MARK FEAGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

MARK FEAGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KOLENDA, REBEKAH

Respondent

KOLENDA, DANIEL PAUL III

Not Classified By Court

THOMPSON, REBEKAH DIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RAYBON, JENNIFER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING 04/06/2022 @ 3:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 4/6/2022 at 0330 PM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMOTION UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MAKE COURT RECORDS CONFIDENTIAL AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE RESPONDENTS DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 03/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketANSWER,WAIVER, & REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUD. DI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketNOTICE PETITIONER'S DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 12/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILD(RE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001073

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000039DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less