This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County on 09/29/2021 at 15:43:12 (UTC).

KELLY, PAMELA VS BUTLER, DARBY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 KELLY, PAMELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BUTLER, DARBY. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLY, PAMELA

Defendant

BUTLER, DARBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOMOLA, JAESON WAYNE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

09/28/2021:NOTICE VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

SUMMONS VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

09/13/2021:SUMMONS VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIF'S FIRST INTEROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

08/31/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIF'S FIRST INTEROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STEVEN BOX

08/31/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STEVEN BOX

REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

08/31/2021:REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT STEVEN BOX

08/31/2021:REQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT STEVEN BOX

RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

08/30/2021:RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIF'S FIRST INTEROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT STEVEN BOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT DIXIE COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FROM PLAINTIFF FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT STEVEN BOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $100.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002778

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF PAMELA KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR STEVEN BOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FOR DARBY BUTLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FOR PLAINTIFF PAMELA KELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $320.00 Receipt Number MX 2021002773

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase 152021CA000046CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOMOLA, JAESON WAYNE