This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/22/2022 at 18:40:20 (UTC).

JOCELYN, ROBIN, SINGLETON, NATHANIEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 JOCELYN, ROBIN, SINGLETON, NATHANIEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOCELYN, ROBIN

Decedent

SINGLETON, NATHANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

WATSON, CHANA MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (ORIGINAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCOVER LETTER TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING (PAID FUNERAL BILL RECEIPT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING (DEATH CERTIFICATE OF NATHANIEL SINGLETON)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD REALPROPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION WITHOUT WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001822

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase 152022CP000055CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON, CHANA MARIE