This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/15/2022 at 14:52:23 (UTC).

HOLIFIELD, JASON GARY VS SADLER, MALINDA

Case Summary

On 05/16/2022 HOLIFIELD, JASON GARY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SADLER, MALINDA. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLIFIELD, JASON GARY

Defendant

SADLER, MALINDA

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

05/16/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

3 DAY NOTICE

05/16/2022:3 DAY NOTICE

RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

05/16/2022:RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PAPERWORK

05/16/2022:ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PAPERWORK

ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT

05/31/2022:ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

06/06/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketRETURN(S) OF SERVICE for Malinda Sadler on 05/16/2022 to Jason Partin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketRETURN(S) OF SERVICE WORKSHEET FROM CONNOR MEEKINS SHOWING SUBSTITUTE SERVICE TO JEFFREY PARTAIN FOR MALINDA SADLER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FROM DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PAPERWORK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS TO RESPOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001698

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3 DAY NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S OFFICE SERVICE INFO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketCase 152022CC000040CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less