This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/25/2022 at 14:48:15 (UTC).

DOLESE-AGUAYO, SKYE VS WOOLDRIDGE, CARL Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 DOLESE-AGUAYO, SKYE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WOOLDRIDGE, CARL. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLESE-AGUAYO, SKYE

Defendants

WOOLDRIDGE, CARL

WOOLDRIDGE, SKYLOR

 

Court Documents

RETURN(S) OF SERVICE for Carl Wooldridge served on 06/02/2022

06/09/2022:RETURN(S) OF SERVICE for Carl Wooldridge served on 06/02/2022

RETURN(S) OF SERVICE for skylor wooldridge served on 06/02/2022

06/09/2022:RETURN(S) OF SERVICE for skylor wooldridge served on 06/02/2022

SUMMONS- SKYLOR WOOLDRIDGE

05/27/2022:SUMMONS- SKYLOR WOOLDRIDGE

SUMMONS- CARL WOOLDRIDGE

05/27/2022:SUMMONS- CARL WOOLDRIDGE

SHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION

05/27/2022:SHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION

SHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION - CARL

05/27/2022:SHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION - CARL

COMPLAINT

05/27/2022:COMPLAINT

PETITIONERS DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 08/28/2019

05/27/2022:PETITIONERS DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 08/28/2019

EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

06/17/2022:EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

06/17/2022:EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

06/17/2022:EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

06/17/2022:EXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

Order Scheduling Hearing

06/15/2022:Order Scheduling Hearing

Order Scheduling Hearing

06/15/2022:Order Scheduling Hearing

EXHIBITS- PLAINTIFF BROUGHT IN TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

06/15/2022:EXHIBITS- PLAINTIFF BROUGHT IN TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

EXHIBITS - ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT ALONG WITH RECIEPTS AND LETTER DRAWN UP FROM CHANA WATSON ADDRESSED TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING MODIFICATIONS ON AGREEMENT FOR DEED.

06/09/2022:EXHIBITS - ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT ALONG WITH RECIEPTS AND LETTER DRAWN UP FROM CHANA WATSON ADDRESSED TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING MODIFICATIONS ON AGREEMENT FOR DEED.

EXHIBIT - FROM DEFENDANT - COPY OF RECORDED AGREEMENT TO PURCHASE HOME AND RECEIPT FOR RECORDING DOCUMENT

06/09/2022:EXHIBIT - FROM DEFENDANT - COPY OF RECORDED AGREEMENT TO PURCHASE HOME AND RECEIPT FOR RECORDING DOCUMENT

EXHIBITS FROM DEFENDANT - 3 DAY AND 30 DAY NOTICE FROM PLAINTIFF

06/09/2022:EXHIBITS FROM DEFENDANT - 3 DAY AND 30 DAY NOTICE FROM PLAINTIFF

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS FROM PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketPer each party's request, I called to let Plaintiff and Defendant know that there was an In Person Hearing set.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS- PLAINTIFF BROUGHT IN TEXT MESSAGES BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEXHIBITS - DEFENDANT ALSO BROUGHT IN SEVERAL PHOTOS OF HOME AND YARD. NOT SCANNED. PLACING WITH FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS - ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT ALONG WITH RECIEPTS AND LETTER DRAWN UP FROM CHANA WATSON ADDRESSED TO PLAINTIFF REGARDING MODIFICATIONS ON AGREEMENT FOR DEED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- SKYLOR WOOLDRIDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS- CARL WOOLDRIDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION - CARL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Email

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket3 DAY NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONERS DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 08/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001865

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase 152022CC000045CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less