This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County on 06/30/2019 15:42:17

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by DISCOVER BANK against PABALAN, L A in the jurisdiction of Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXXXXXXXXXXAXMX
  • Filing Date 05/31/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Third Circuit Courts - Dixie County
  • Courthouse Dixie County Courthouse
  • County Dixie
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK
  • Represented By
    • CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.
  • Defendant PABALAN, L A
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Not Yet Classified PABALAN, LOURDES A
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • DATED SUMMONS FOR L A PABALAN AKA LOURDES A PABALAN
  • 06/05/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number MX 29609
  • 06/05/2019
  • Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO
  • 05/31/2019
  • SUMMONS FOR LOURDES PABALAN
  • 05/31/2019
  • COMPLAINT
  • 05/31/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 05/31/2019
  • Case 152019CA000025CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/31/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.