Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 04/01/2021 at 18:00:38 (UTC).

DAVIS, COLTON JAMES, DAVIS, KELSEY ALEXANDRA Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 DAVIS, COLTON JAMES, DAVIS, KELSEY ALEXANDRA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and GRIFFIN, JENNIFER R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Dixie County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dixie County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

GRIFFIN, JENNIFER R

 

Party Details

Respondent

DAVIS, COLTON JAMES

Not Classified By Court

LANDER, aka KELSEY ALEXANDRA

DAVIS, KELSEY ALEXANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder Scheduling Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR TRAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE LETTER FROM CASE WORKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDRIVER LICENSE- LANDER ( DAVIS ) ISSUE DATE- 01/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketDRIVER LICENSE- DAVIS ISSUE DATE 03/08/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- LANDER ( DAVIS )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2021000608

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase 152021DR000061DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDER CO., INC. is a litigant