This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 12/18/2021 at 14:46:35 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS WILLS, JOHN

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed an Other lawsuit against WILLS, JOHN. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES and JENNIFER JOHNSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES

JENNIFER JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

WILLS, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED COMPLAINT

11/18/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/18/2021:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/06/2022 10:00; Judge: JOHNSON, JENNIFER JONES; Docket Type: COUNTY CIVIL PT; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent COUNTY CIVIL PT scheduled on 1/6/2022 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge JENNIFER JOHNSON presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM FILED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketCase 152021CC000118CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debski, Michael Thiel