This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 18:39:08 (UTC).

BRIELS, SHARON, RUNNELLS, MARLO KAY Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 BRIELS, SHARON, RUNNELLS, MARLO KAY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUNNELLS, MARLO KAY

Decedent

BRIELS, SHARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WATSON, CHANA MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCOVER LETTER (ATTACHED TO ORIGINAL DEALTH CERT FROM ATTORNEY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE (ORIGINAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $345.00 Receipt Number MX 2022001699

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDefense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION WITHOUT WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCase 152022CP000052CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON, CHANA MARIE