This case was last updated from Dixie County Courts on 12/08/2022 at 17:45:12 (UTC).

BOWMAN, TONYA MARIE, HENDRICKS, FRANKLIN D Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 BOWMAN, TONYA MARIE, HENDRICKS, FRANKLIN D was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Dixie County Courts, Dixie County Courthouse located in Dixie, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD and MARK FEAGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Dixie, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEAGLE, MARK EDWARD

MARK FEAGLE

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

HENDRICKS, FRANKLIN D

BOWMAN, TONYA MARIE

ZUZA, TONYA MARIE

HENDRICKS, TONYA MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING 01/17/2023 @ 10:30am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/17/2023 at 1030 AM, VZ - Judge MARK FEAGLE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL - WIFE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL - HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - WIFE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - HUSBAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketWIFE'S DRIVER LICENSE- ISSUE DATE 03/19/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketHUSBAND'S DRIVER LICENSE - ISSUE DATE 06/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR PAYMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MX 2022003910

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase 152022DR000273DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less