This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 12/28/2020 at 13:02:54 (UTC).

WHEATLEY, PAMELA VS DOUGLAS, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 10/19/2016 WHEATLEY, PAMELA filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against DOUGLAS, ROBERT. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON T, GLORIA DEMEDIO, HALL, DON THOMAS and BONNER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON T

GLORIA DEMEDIO

HALL, DON THOMAS

BONNER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WHEATLEY, PAMELA

Respondent

DOUGLAS, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MCCARTHY, AMANDA GAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketTERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCOURT NOTES SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEvent CSH scheduled on 7/8/2020 at 0230 PM, MA - Judge GLORIA DEMEDIO presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING:7/8/20 @2:30PM (VIA ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketJACS PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketNCP CPYS SENT BY CERT MAIL THIS DATE BW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF REGISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketCERT CPY OF PAY HSTY (MISSOURI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketCERT CPY OF ORDER (MISSOURI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketREGISTRATION STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • DocketREQUEST TO REGISTER SUP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketCase 142016DR000525DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 10/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCARTHY, AMANDA