This case was last updated from Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/28/2019 at 20:00:56 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO VS CRIDER, ALICE J Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CRIDER, ALICE J. This case was filed in Desoto County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court , Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON T and BREWER, DANIELLE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON T

BREWER, DANIELLE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSO

Defendants

DOUGLAS, TRUDY A

CRIDER, ALICE J

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICE J CRID

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRUDY A DOUG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANNESS, JOHN ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

NOTICE LIS PENDENS

05/29/2019:NOTICE LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

05/29/2019:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED-TRUDY A. DOUGLAS

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-TRUDY A. DOUGLAS

SUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRUDY A. DOUGLAS

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRUDY A. DOUGLAS

SUMMONS ISSUED-ALICE J. CRIDER

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-ALICE J. CRIDER

SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICE J. CRIDER

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICE J. CRIDER

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION

05/29/2019:CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

05/29/2019:VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

RETURN OF SERVICE (ALICE CRIDER) RCVD BY SUB SRVC SHARON MORRISON 6/13/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (ALICE CRIDER) RCVD BY SUB SRVC SHARON MORRISON 6/13/19

RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE ALICE) NON SERVED 6/13/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE ALICE) NON SERVED 6/13/19

RETURN OF SERVICE (TRUDY DOUGLAS) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (TRUDY DOUGLAS) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

06/21/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

06/24/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (TRUDY DOUGLAS) RCVD BY SUB SRVC ADAM CRIDER 6/14/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (UNK SPOUSE ALICE) NON SERVED 6/13/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE (ALICE CRIDER) RCVD BY SUB SRVC SHARON MORRISON 6/13/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Docket"FORM A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALICE J. CRIDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-ALICE J. CRIDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED- UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TRUDY A. DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-TRUDY A. DOUGLAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number MA 70296

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $945.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase 142019CA000269CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VanNess, John Anthony