This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County on 06/22/2019 at 20:00:37 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS RAINES, BRADLEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RAINES, BRADLEY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Desoto County, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BREWER, DANIELLE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BREWER, DANIELLE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY 3

UNKNOWN PARTY 1

RAINES, MATTHEW NELSON

RAINES, THOMAS

UNKNOWN PARTY 4

RAINES, THE UNKNOWN HEIRS VEST

UNKNOWN PARTY 2

RAINES, BRADLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDHARDT, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK PARTY #2) NOT FOUND 5/31/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK PARTY #2) NOT FOUND 5/31/19

RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK PARTY) NOT FOUND 5/31/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK PARTY) NOT FOUND 5/31/19

RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY MATTHEW NELSON RAINES 5/31/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY MATTHEW NELSON RAINES 5/31/19

RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY THOMAS RAINES 6/1/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY THOMAS RAINES 6/1/19

RETURN OF SERVICE (BRADLEY RAINES) RCVD BY SUB SRVC THOMAS RAINES 6/17/19

06/18/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE (BRADLEY RAINES) RCVD BY SUB SRVC THOMAS RAINES 6/17/19

VERIFIED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS & RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

05/31/2019:VERIFIED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS & RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

COMPLAINT

05/23/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED-MATTHEW NELSON RAINES

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-MATTHEW NELSON RAINES

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

05/23/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN PARTY #2

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN PARTY #2

SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN PARTY #1

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN PARTY #1

SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VESTER NELSON RAINES, DECEASED

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VESTER NELSON RAINES, DECEASED

SUMMONS ISSUED-THOMAS RAINES

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-THOMAS RAINES

SUMMONS ISSUED-BRADLEY RAINES

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED-BRADLEY RAINES

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE

05/23/2019:VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

05/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK PARTY #2) NOT FOUND 5/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE (UNK PARTY) NOT FOUND 5/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY MATTHEW NELSON RAINES 5/31/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE RCVD BY THOMAS RAINES 6/1/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE (BRADLEY RAINES) RCVD BY SUB SRVC THOMAS RAINES 6/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Judge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • RESPONSE FROM MATTHEW NELSON RAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFIED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF SERVICE OF PROCESS & RETURN OF SUMMONS TO ISSUING CLERK OF COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED-MATTHEW NELSON RAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED-UNKNOWN HEIRS OF VESTER NELSON RAINES, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED-THOMAS RAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED-BRADLEY RAINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Payment received: $965.00 Receipt Number MA 70175

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $965.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $965.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Case 142019CA000261CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDHARDT , CHRISTOPHER CHARLES