This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 11/30/2021 at 05:45:48 (UTC).

SWINNEY, PER. REP. FOR THE EST VS FEISTER, CONNIE

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 SWINNEY, PER REP FOR THE EST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FEISTER, CONNIE. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN, DANIELLE BREWER and BREWER, DANIELLE L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN

DANIELLE BREWER

BREWER, DANIELLE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SWINNEY, PER. REP. FOR THE EST

Defendant

FEISTER, CONNIE

 

Court Documents

ZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-CONNIE FEISTER

07/14/2021:ZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-CONNIE FEISTER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/14/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

07/14/2021:NOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY FILED

07/14/2021:STATEMENT OF RESPONSIBILITY FILED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-CONNIE FEISTER 7/15/2021

07/16/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED-CONNIE FEISTER 7/15/2021

ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

10/12/2021:ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

10/22/2021:ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT PAID MEDIATION FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $60.00 Receipt Number MA 94643

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 Total Assessed $60.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketAMENDED COURT NOTES SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 10/19/2021 13:30; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Docket Type: PTC; Location: DESOTO COUNTY COURTHOUSE Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketCOURT NOTES SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM (MISSING PAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PERMANENT MAILING ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number MA 91510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $310.00 Balance Remaining $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketZOOM SUMMONS ISSUED-CONNIE FEISTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase 142021SC000273SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L assigned

    Read MoreRead Less