This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 12/01/2021 at 07:40:02 (UTC).

RUIZ HERNANDEZ, MAGDALENO VS SIQUINAJAY SALINAS, SELENE

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 RUIZ HERNANDEZ, MAGDALENO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SIQUINAJAY SALINAS, SELENE. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON THOMAS and HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON THOMAS

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUIZ HERNANDEZ, MAGDALENO

Respondent

SIQUINAJAY SALINAS, SELENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED 8/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS-GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-SELENE SIQUINAJAY-SALINAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase 142021DR000338DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL