This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 09/22/2020 at 18:02:07 (UTC).

ROWAN, JOSHUA VS GRUGAN, KRISTEN

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 ROWAN, JOSHUA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GRUGAN, KRISTEN. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON T and HALL, DON THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON T

HALL, DON THOMAS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROWAN, JOSHUA

Respondent

GRUGAN, KRISTEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN F/R INST#202014005433

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT-RESP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT-SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketBASIC PARENTING PLAN-SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - HUSBAND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number MA 82457

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketHUSBAND'S NOTICE OF FILING ENLARGED COPY OF FL D.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLETION OF PARENITNG COURSE-MOTHER & FATHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL FOR SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase 142020DR000364DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL