This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 18:02:26 (UTC).

RANSOM, BAREFOOT VS TAYLOR, BRENDA C.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 RANSOM, BAREFOOT filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TAYLOR, BRENDA C. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HALL, DON THOMAS and HALL, DON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HALL, DON THOMAS

HALL, DON T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RANSOM, BAREFOOT

Respondent

TAYLOR, BRENDA C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCK #16758 FOR $400.00 TO ZACHARY RIBEL PER ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REFUND FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO REFUND FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(DUPLICATE) APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-BRENDA TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: HALL , DON T HONORABLE Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS-GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MA 93265

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase 142021DR000429DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL