This case was last updated from Desoto County Courts on 11/26/2021 at 04:29:45 (UTC).

RAMIREZ, ROSALVA VS BOONE, RANDY SCOTT Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 RAMIREZ, ROSALVA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BOONE, RANDY SCOTT. This case was filed in Desoto County Courts, Desoto County Courthouse located in DeSoto, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN and BREWER, DANIELLE L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMA

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    DeSoto, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BREWER, DANIELLE LYNN

BREWER, DANIELLE L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ, ROSALVA

Defendants

BOONE, RANDY SCOTT

HANDLIN, NATALIE JANEL

DOE, JOHN

DOE, JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIBEL, ZACHARY MARK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

07/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION AND DETAINER

07/14/2021:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION AND DETAINER

CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

07/14/2021:CONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/14/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED (NOT ISSUED SUMMONS FEE DUE)

07/14/2021:EVICTION SUMMONS/RESIDENTIAL ISSUED (NOT ISSUED SUMMONS FEE DUE)

RETURN OF SERVICE

07/26/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

07/26/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT RANDY SCOTT BOONE-SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

07/28/2021:RESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT RANDY SCOTT BOONE-SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

MOTION FOR FJ FOR POSSESSION-RESIDENTIAL EVICTION FOR OTHER THAN NON-PAYMENT OF RENT

07/29/2021:MOTION FOR FJ FOR POSSESSION-RESIDENTIAL EVICTION FOR OTHER THAN NON-PAYMENT OF RENT

NOTICE OF HEARING-8/24/2021 @ 10:45AM

08/09/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING-8/24/2021 @ 10:45AM

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS 1-3

08/26/2021:PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS 1-3

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION F/R INST#202114006841

09/09/2021:FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION F/R INST#202114006841

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

09/09/2021:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

WRIT RETURNED EXECUTED-ALL PERSONS 9/10/21

09/13/2021:WRIT RETURNED EXECUTED-ALL PERSONS 9/10/21

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED EXECUTED-ALL PERSONS 9/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION F/R INST#202114006841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS 1-3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING-8/24/2021 @ 10:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FJ FOR POSSESSION-RESIDENTIAL EVICTION FOR OTHER THAN NON-PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM DEFENDANT RANDY SCOTT BOONE-SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED-RANDY SCOTT BOONE 7/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED POSTED-NATALIE HANDLIN 7/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketJudge: BREWER , DANIELLE L Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED-RANDY SCOTT BOONE, NATALIE JANEL HANDLIN, JOHN DOE , AND JANE DOE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION AND DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MA 91484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCase 142021CC000272CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZACHARY MARK RIBEL